+0  
 
0
287
6
avatar

What is 17 * 24. No Calculator!

Guest May 26, 2015

Best Answer 

 #5
avatar+248 
+10

Here's the Exact process I followed to solve it in my head:

Split it up into 2 parts, 17*20 + 17* 4

First work out 17*4 in my head and remember it -> 10*4 + 7*4 = 40+28 = 68

Now 17*20 is 17*10*2 = 340.

Now I just add up these two numbers -> 340 + 68 = 408

Brodudedoodebrodude  May 27, 2015
Sort: 

6+0 Answers

 #1
avatar
+5

it is 408...

Guest May 26, 2015
 #2
avatar+17649 
+5

If you can multiply by 2 and keep some numbers in mind, you can do it without a calculator and without writing anything down but the final answer.

17 x 2  =  34

17 x 4  =  17 x (2 x 2)  =  (17 x 2) x 2  =  34 x 2  =  68 

17 x 20  =  (17 x 2) x 10  =  34 x 10  =  340

If you can keep those two answers in mind, ading 340 and 68 gives you 408.

(340 + 68  =  340 + 60 + 8  =  408)

geno3141  May 26, 2015
 #3
avatar+78551 
+5

17 * 24  =

 

34 * 12  =

 

68 * 6 =

 

60*6  + 8*6  =   360 + 48  = 408

 

 

CPhill  May 27, 2015
 #4
avatar+26322 
+10

(20 - 3)*(20 + 4) = 20^2 +20*4 - 20*3 - 3*4 = 400 + 20 - 12 = 408

.

Alan  May 27, 2015
 #5
avatar+248 
+10
Best Answer

Here's the Exact process I followed to solve it in my head:

Split it up into 2 parts, 17*20 + 17* 4

First work out 17*4 in my head and remember it -> 10*4 + 7*4 = 40+28 = 68

Now 17*20 is 17*10*2 = 340.

Now I just add up these two numbers -> 340 + 68 = 408

Brodudedoodebrodude  May 27, 2015
 #6
avatar+4663 
+5

I use Brodude'smethod.

 

It seems to be simple and easy.

MathsGod1  May 27, 2015

20 Online Users

avatar
avatar
avatar
avatar
We use cookies to personalise content and ads, to provide social media features and to analyse our traffic. We also share information about your use of our site with our social media, advertising and analytics partners.  See details