+0  
 
0
86
2
avatar

34x74

 Mar 30, 2022
 #1
avatar+599 
-1

You could either use a calculator, or be smart:

 

I am guessing the big brain way would be to use this as a factored quadratic:

(30 + 4)(70 + 4) = 34 x 74.

30x70 + 4x70 + 4x30 + 4x4 = 34 x 74. (FOILing)

2100 + 4(70 + 30) + 16 = 34 x 74.

2100 + 400 + 16 = 34x74.

2516 = 34x74.

 

:)

 Mar 30, 2022

33 Online Users

avatar