+0

# (55*32)X=313

+5
573
13

(55*32)X=313

x=?

Jan 5, 2016

#6
+8613
+5

Simplifying

(55 * 32) * X = 313

Multiply 55 * 32

(1760) * X = 313

Solving

1760X = 313

Solving for variable 'X'.

Move all terms containing X to the left, all other terms to the right.

Divide each side by '1760'.

X = 0.1778409091

Simplifying

X = 0.1778409091

Oppsie! I see what I did wrong!

Jan 5, 2016

#1
+8613
0

First You wanna Do 55*32

Which will be: 1760.

then divide, So X will be..

x: 5.62300319489

Jan 5, 2016
#2
+128
0

Jan 5, 2016
#3
+4080
0

I thought you had to multiply the product of 55 and 32 by x? When they're touching doesn't it mean multiply?

Jan 5, 2016
#4
+5

Options are

.17784...

17784

3193

.210

Jan 5, 2016
#5
+8613
0

Interesting!! >:(

Jan 5, 2016
#6
+8613
+5

Simplifying

(55 * 32) * X = 313

Multiply 55 * 32

(1760) * X = 313

Solving

1760X = 313

Solving for variable 'X'.

Move all terms containing X to the left, all other terms to the right.

Divide each side by '1760'.

X = 0.1778409091

Simplifying

X = 0.1778409091

Oppsie! I see what I did wrong!

Hayley1 Jan 5, 2016
#7
+128
0

its baby question which i did long back

sorry i didnt concentrate too much on your question

where do you live hayley 1

Jan 5, 2016
edited by aditya@calc.com  Jan 5, 2016
edited by aditya@calc.com  Jan 5, 2016
#8
+8613
0

Why??

Jan 5, 2016
#9
+4080
0

Ok, now it makes more since. I was seriously confused.:)))

Jan 5, 2016
#10
+4080
0

Warning!

To any guest who is thinking about becoming a member.

If you make a mistake, they've got a name to go with it.lol

Jan 5, 2016
#11
+4080
0

Haley, have you heard "used to luv u" I luv it

Jan 5, 2016
#12
+102465
+5

(55*32)X=313

X= 313/(55*32)

313/(55*32) = 0.1778409090909091

Jan 6, 2016
#13
0

LMAO, thats is a xda developer questionary for faster to posting post for newbie..

check this out: